Advertisements

- 11. In a class of 25 students in an examination in maths 3 students scored 95 marks each, 3 get zero each and the average of the rest was 45. What is the average of the whole class?

Answer: Option B

Explanation:**Total marks obtained by a class of 25 students**

= 3*95 + 3*0 + 19 * 45 =1140

Average marks of whole class = 1140/25 =45.6

= 3*95 + 3*0 + 19 * 45 =1140

Average marks of whole class = 1140/25 =45.6

- 12. In a class of 25 students in an examination in maths 3 students scored 95 marks each, 3 get zero each and the average of the rest was 45. What is the average of the whole class?

Answer: Option B

Explanation:**Total marks obtained by a class of 25 students**

= 3*95 + 3*0 + 19 * 45 =1140

Average marks of whole class = 1140/25 =45.6

= 3*95 + 3*0 + 19 * 45 =1140

Average marks of whole class = 1140/25 =45.6

- 13. A man's average daily expenditure is Rs 12 during March, Rs. 14 during April and Rs. 17 during May. Find the Average daily expenditure for the three months

Answer: Option C

Explanation:**Average daily expenditure**

= Total expenditure / no. of days

= 31*12 + 30*14 + 31*17/92

= 14.33

= Total expenditure / no. of days

= 31*12 + 30*14 + 31*17/92

= 14.33

- 14. In the first 10 overs of a cricket game, the run rate was only 3.2. What should be the run rate in the remaining 40 overs to reach the target of 282 runs?

Answer: Option A

Explanation:**Runs scored in the first 10 overs = 10 × 3.2 = 32**

Total runs = 282

Remaining runs to be scored = 282 - 32 = 250

Remaining overs = 40

Run rate needed = 250/40 = 6.25

Total runs = 282

Remaining runs to be scored = 282 - 32 = 250

Remaining overs = 40

Run rate needed = 250/40 = 6.25

- 15. A grocer has a sale of Rs. 6435, Rs. 6927, Rs. 6855, Rs. 7230 and Rs. 6562 for 5 consecutive months. How much sale must he have in the sixth month so that he gets an average sale of Rs. 6500?

Answer: Option B

Explanation:**Let the sale in the sixth month =x
Then (6435+6927+6855+7230+6562+x)/6 = 6500
=> 6435 + 6927 + 6855 + 7230 + 6562 + x = 6 × 6500
=> 34009 + x = 39000
=> x=39000 − 34009 = 4991**

**To whom this Averages Questions and Answers section is beneficial?**

Students can learn and improve on their skillset for using Verbal Ability effectively and can also prepare for competitive examinations like...

- All I.B.P.S and Public Sector Bank Competitive Exam
- Common Aptitude Test (CAT) Exams
- UPSC Paper-II or CSAT Exams
- SSC Competitive Exams
- Defence Competitive Exams
- L.I.C / G.I.C AO and Clerk Competitive Exams
- Railway Competitive Exam
- University Grants Commission (UGC)
- Career Aptitude Test (IT Companies) and etc.